08/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7569 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25219 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25219 |
|
|
28/02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|