Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 759 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14165 Week
» 67181 Month
» 186708 Year
» 3213561 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7570 |
04/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25220 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/05/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/10/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
14/05/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7570 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
14/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25220 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
13/06/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25220 |
|
|
18/05/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|