Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1141 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24772 Week
» 89726 Month
» 292390 Year
» 3319243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7572 |
17/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25222 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/02/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/10/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
24/02/1968 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7572 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25222 |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25222 |
|
|
12/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|