Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1926 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19729 Week
» 72745 Month
» 192272 Year
» 3219125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7582 |
07/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25232 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/01/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/09/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
07/01/1964 |
Power Unit VA797 |
|
|
|
07/01/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21209 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7582 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25232 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25232 from Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
28/05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|