Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7583 |
21/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25233 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
21/01/1964 |
Power Unit VA772 |
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21208 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7583 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25233 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
13/03/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25233 |
|
|
06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|