Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7595 |
20/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25245 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
13/07/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
13/07/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
20/06/1964 |
Power Unit VA924 |
|
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21057 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7595 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
11/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
13/07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25245 |
|
|
25/06/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25245 |
|
|
08/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|