Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2800 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16206 Week
» 69222 Month
» 188749 Year
» 3215602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7596 |
07/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25246 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/06/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
28/06/1968 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
07/07/1964 |
Power Unit VA928 |
|
|
|
07/07/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21087 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7596 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
28/06/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25246 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25246 |
|
|
05/03/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|