Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 723 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18526 Week
» 71542 Month
» 191069 Year
» 3217922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76004 |
on |
24/12/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76004 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
27/10/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. |
|
|
30/04/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. |
|
|
23/10/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 23/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. |
|
|
06/08/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 06/09/1958. |
|
|
06/04/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. |
|
|
15/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1961. Dep: 11/11/1961. |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
03/05/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1963. Dep: 08/06/1963. |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
20/06/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1966. Dep: 16/07/1966. |
|
|
19/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76004 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|