Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 381 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18184 Week
» 71200 Month
» 190727 Year
» 3217580 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7601 |
16/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25251 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/02/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/02/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7601 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
18/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25251 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25251 |
|
|
30/11/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|