|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 03/08/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 18 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 24/04/1956 | 25/05/1956 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 06/09/1957 | 14/09/1957 | 9 days | Non Classified | |||
Eastleigh Works | 22/04/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 32 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 06/11/1959 | 28/11/1959 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 30/05/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 15/03/1962 | 31/03/1962 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 13/12/1962 | 05/01/1963 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 23/08/1963 | 05/10/1963 | 44 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/03/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76010 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
||
03/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. | ||
24/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1956. Dep: 25/05/1956. | ||
06/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 06/09/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957. | ||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. | ||
13/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) | ||
11/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
06/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1959. Dep: 28/11/1959. | ||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. | ||
15/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962. | ||
13/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1962. Dep: 05/01/1963. | ||
23/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1963. Dep: 05/10/1963. | ||
10/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) | ||
04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76010 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |