Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 14 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6860 Week
» 18407 Month
» 418089 Year
» 494676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76017   06/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 06/1953 to Eastleigh (71A)
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Service Life 12 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71A Eastleigh (New) 06/1953
72B Salisbury 4w/e 10/03/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 20/07/1953
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 04/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 76017
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
08/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day - Open day exhibit RO 9/1954 Link
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 76017    

prev prev