Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 336 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2901 Week
» 1639 Month
» 415960 Year
» 1637525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 76023 m/e 12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 12/1952 to Sunderland (54A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 12 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
54A Sunderland (New) m/e 12/1952
51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 18/06/1955
51H Kirkby Stephen m/e 21/07/1956
24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 30/04/1960
8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 06/08/1960
21D Aston w/e 21/07/1962
5D Stoke w/e 22/12/1962
5F Uttoxeter w/e 12/10/1963
5B Crewe South w/e 20/06/1964
5D Stoke w/e 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 54A Sunderland w/e 31/12/1952
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 51H Kirkby Stephen 4w/e 21/07/1956
LOAN 12E Kirkby Stephen on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 12E Kirkby Stephen on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 21D Aston 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 5F Uttoxeter 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 5D Stoke 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 09/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/08/1962 Aston MPD B.R. Standard Class 4s 76020/2/3/51 have been transferred here from Springs Branch (replaced there by WDs) and are working local goods trips. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76023
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Sunderland (54A)
   
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
09/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 76023    

prev prev