Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 308 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18111 Week
» 71127 Month
» 190654 Year
» 3217507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76027 |
on |
15/10/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
4w/e |
04/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
w/e |
21/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
5w/e |
05/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76027 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76027 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|