Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76030 m/e 11/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 11/1953 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/04/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Stratford (New) m/e 11/1953
31A Cambridge w/e 18/06/1960
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
75A Brighton w/e 08/12/1962
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30A Stratford 17/11/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 25/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 76030
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 76030    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev