Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76033 m/e 12/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 12/1953 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawal During 01/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 13 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Stratford (New) m/e 12/1953
31A Cambridge w/e 18/06/1960
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
75A Brighton w/e 08/12/1962
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
70C Guildford 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30A Stratford 17/12/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 31D South Lynn 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 12/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 76033
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76033    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev