Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4070 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17476 Week
» 70492 Month
» 190019 Year
» 3216872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76047 |
on |
18/03/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76047 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76047 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|