Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2571 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15977 Week
» 68993 Month
» 188520 Year
» 3215373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76071 |
on |
05/10/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
7w/e |
29/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
5w/e |
12/12/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76071 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
17/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76071 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|