Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 602 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6207 Week
» 17754 Month
» 417436 Year
» 494023 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76077   12/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1956 to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D)
Withdrawal During 12/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 11 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) 12/1956
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 76077
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Sutton Oak (10D)
   
29/04/1967 Sightings A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76077 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    

prev prev