Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1041 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8501 Week
» 6014 Month
» 233898 Year
» 1455463 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76097 m/e 09/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 09/1957 to Corkerhill (67A)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 13/07/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 6 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
67A Corkerhill (New) m/e 09/1957
67C Ayr 4w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 67A Corkerhill 25/09/1957
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   w/e 13/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/07/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76097
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 76097    

prev prev