Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 816 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18619 Week
» 71635 Month
» 191162 Year
» 3218015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76101 |
on |
06/06/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65D |
Dawsholm |
on |
06/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
6w/e |
07/11/1964 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
3w/e |
30/10/1965 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76101 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stranraer (67F) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76101 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|