Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1633 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15039 Week
» 68055 Month
» 187582 Year
» 3214435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76102 |
on |
14/06/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65D |
Dawsholm |
on |
14/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
17/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
6w/e |
07/11/1964 |
ALLOC |
67E |
Dumfries |
3w/e |
30/10/1965 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76102 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76102 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|