Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 715 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4351 Week
» 23996 Month
» 58638 Year
» 1280203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76105 m/e 07/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 07/1957 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 24/01/1966
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 8 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) m/e 07/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
64C Dalry Road 6w/e 30/12/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 28/03/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 24/01/1966
66A Polmadie 5w/e 29/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster 13/07/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 6w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 5w/e 11/04/1964
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 24/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 76105
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
28/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76105    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev