Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 164 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5918 Week
» 33876 Month
» 68518 Year
» 1290083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76106 m/e 07/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 07/1957 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/09/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 8 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) m/e 07/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 04/06/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
64C Dalry Road 6w/e 30/12/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 28/03/1964
1A Willesden w/e 04/09/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 18/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster 24/07/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 04/06/1960
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 6w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 5w/e 11/04/1964
LOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/09/1965
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 11/09/1965
WDN   w/e 18/09/1965
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 09/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 76106
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
28/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 76106    
04/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev