Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 541 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6295 Week
» 34253 Month
» 68895 Year
» 1290460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76108 m/e 08/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 08/1957 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Thu 14/07/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 8 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) m/e 08/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
67B Hurlford 4w/e 19/01/1963
   Withdrawn 14/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster 10/08/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   14/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 76108
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76108    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev