Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76112 |
on |
19/09/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
68B |
Dumfries |
on |
19/09/1957 |
ALLOC |
68C |
Stranraer |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76112 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Dumfries (68B) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stranraer (68C) |
|
|
29/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76112 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|