Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1619 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15025 Week
» 68041 Month
» 187568 Year
» 3214421 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7617 |
12/08/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25267 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/08/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/11/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
16/11/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7617 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25267 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25267 |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|