Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7628 12/08/1965
TOPS (Tops) 25278 31/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 25
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service 12/08/1965
Withdrawn 01/03/1987
Time in Service 21 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Tinsley (New) 12/08/1965
41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 12/08/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/08/1967
D16 Nottingham Division 17/06/1968
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 25/01/1969
LO Longsight w/e 11/05/1974
SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/12/1974
CW Cricklewood East 3w/e 08/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/03/1987

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/08/1965 To Service To service as D7628
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Allocated to Tinsley (41A)
   
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
27/07/1969 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Test roads RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 25278    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (LO)    
11/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
07/12/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
01/03/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 25278    

prev prev