Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3161 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16567 Week
» 69583 Month
» 189110 Year
» 3215963 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7629 |
07/09/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25279 |
29/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
8039 |
To Service |
07/09/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
18/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/09/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7629 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8039 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
29/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25279 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
18/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25279 |
|
|