Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 33 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6248 Week
» 17953 Month
» 349442 Year
» 426029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7633 30/10/1965
TOPS (Tops) 25283 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 25
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service 30/10/1965
Withdrawn 01/03/1987
Time in Service 21 yrs, 4 mths , -1 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Tinsley (New) 30/10/1965
41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966
91M To London Midland Region w/e 14/10/1967
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/10/1967
D08 Liverpool Division 17/06/1968
D02 Birmingham Division 2w/e 19/08/1972
D01 London Division w/e 06/01/1973
D08 Liverpool Division w/e 10/02/1973
   Withdrawn 01/03/1987

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1965 To Service To service as D7633
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Allocated to Tinsley (41A)
   
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
14/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
19/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 25283    
06/01/1973 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
10/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
01/03/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 25283    

prev prev