Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18242 Week
» 71258 Month
» 190785 Year
» 3217638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7646 |
25/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25296 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25906 |
13/12/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/03/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7646 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
27/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25296 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25906 |
|
|
01/10/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25906 |
|
|
12/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|