Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 164 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17967 Week
» 70983 Month
» 190510 Year
» 3217363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7651 |
09/05/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25301 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/05/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
05/05/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/05/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
05/05/1972 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/05/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7651 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25301 |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/12/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25301 |
|
|
08/09/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|