Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4321 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13895 Week
» 78849 Month
» 281513 Year
» 3308366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7652 |
21/05/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25302 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/05/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/05/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/02/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Not Known |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7652 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25302 |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
14/06/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25302 |
|
|
07/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|