Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1673 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19476 Week
» 72492 Month
» 192019 Year
» 3218872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7661 |
08/11/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25311 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
08/11/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7661 Built at Derby Works Allocated to London Division (D01) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25311 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
19/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25311 |
|
|
03/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|