Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 611 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19522 Week
» 84476 Month
» 287140 Year
» 3313993 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7666 |
16/12/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25316 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25911 |
16/12/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
16/12/1966 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7666 Built at Derby Works Allocated to London Division (D01) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25316 |
|
|
04/1984 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
16/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25911 |
|
|
01/09/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25911 |
|
|
03/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|