Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7667 |
28/01/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25317 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
28/01/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7667 Built at Derby Works Allocated to London Division (D01) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25317 |
|
|
24/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25317 |
|
|
30/04/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|