Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 497 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5098 Week
» 16645 Month
» 416327 Year
» 492914 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7672 25/02/1967
TOPS (Tops) 25322 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 25
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 25/02/1967
Withdrawn 01/09/1991
Time in Service 24 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) 25/02/1967
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/07/1967
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
D08 Liverpool Division w/e 09/05/1970
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 08/07/1972
KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 12/05/1973
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 28/02/1976
   Withdrawn 01/09/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1967 To Service To service as D7672
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
08/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 25322    
12/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM)    
28/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
01/09/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 25322    

prev prev