Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 492 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6276 Week
» 27665 Month
» 147192 Year
» 3174045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7673 |
25/03/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25323 |
13/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
25/03/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
09/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
bX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7673 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
13/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25323 |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
19/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25323 |
|
|
10/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|