Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1483 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14889 Week
» 67905 Month
» 187432 Year
» 3214285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7676 |
22/04/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25326 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
22/04/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/02/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
02/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
bX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7676 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25326 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25326 |
|
|
28/02/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|