Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1145 Today
» 1080 Yesterday
» 6833 Week
» 23545 Month
» 23545 Year
» 534647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 77009   05/06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 3
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 05/06/1954 to Perth South (29A)
Withdrawal Thu 12/05/1966
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
29A Perth South (New) 05/06/1954
66A Polmadie 3w/e 25/12/1954
66E Carstairs 2w/e 07/09/1963
65F Grangemouth w/e 12/10/1963
66B Motherwell 2w/e 23/10/1965
   Withdrawn 12/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 63A Perth South 05/06/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1954
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 3w/e 30/10/1965
WDN   12/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 77009
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Perth South (29A )
   
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
07/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
12/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
12/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 77009    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev