Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 198 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4464 Week
» 16242 Month
» 305634 Year
» 816736 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 77011   16/06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 3
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 16/06/1954 to Darlington (51A)
Withdrawal Sat 05/02/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
51A Darlington (New) 16/06/1954
51F West Auckland 08/08/1954
52C Blaydon 29/05/1955
52c Alston 17/12/1955
52A Gateshead 27/09/1959
52H Tyne Dock 11/09/1960
SBH Blyth (South) 23/04/1961
51L Thornaby 21/10/1962
55B Stourton 15/09/1963
8E Northwich 01/11/1964
   Withdrawn 05/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 51A Darlington 16/06/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1954
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 52CALSTON   4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 5w/e 10/11/1962
ALLOC 55B Stourton 4w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 05/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/06/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 77011
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Darlington (51A )
   
08/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
29/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Alston (52c)    
27/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
23/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (South) (SBH)    
21/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
15/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stourton (55B)    
01/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
05/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 77011    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev