Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 69 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4926 Week
» 16631 Month
» 348120 Year
» 424707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7714   05/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Kerr Stuart
To Service During 05/1930
Withdrawal During 01/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/12/1958
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 31/01/1959
WDN   m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd m/e 28/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 1973
Current Status Unserviceable
Information Not steamed since 1992 - currently in the Engine House at Highley as a static exhibit.
Link www.svr.co.uk/
Status Date 19/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 7714
Built at Kerr Stuart
   
01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 7714    

prev prev