|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/04/1965 | Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) | In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. | SLS/196505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1930 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7722 Built at Kerr Stuart, Works Number 4457 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) | ||
12/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) | ||
31/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) | ||
31/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) | ||
22/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
26/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
24/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7722 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |