Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 456 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1841 Week
» 8646 Month
» 115592 Year
» 1337157 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7726 m/e 12/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 12/1929
Withdrawal During 08/1960
Scrapping During 10/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WES Westbury 4w/e 30/10/1948
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 30/04/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 3w/e 17/05/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 04/10/1952
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/12/1953
88C Barry 4w/e 09/08/1958
88E Abercynon 4w/e 29/11/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WES Westbury 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   m/e 31/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 7726
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (WES)    
30/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 7726    
10/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev