Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7750 |
m/e |
11/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7750 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24038 |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (HFD) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
05/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7750 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|