Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 253 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 253 Week
» 34828 Month
» 104307 Year
» 1325872 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7751 m/e 12/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 12/1930
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960
Service Life 28 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 06/10/1956
88E Abercynon 4w/e 25/01/1958
88A Radyr 4w/e 12/06/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 27/12/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 88C Barry m/e 31/01/1959
WDN   m/e 31/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 7751
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 7751    

prev prev