Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 958 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 958 Week
» 958 Month
» 190093 Year
» 1411658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7754 m/e 12/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 24042
To Service During 12/1930
Withdrawal Tue 27/01/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1930
   Withdrawn 27/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WLN Wellington 4w/e 21/05/1949
WDN   m/e 31/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 7754
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 7754    
12/1971 Sightings NCB Mountain Ash Colliery - In use RO 4/1972  

prev prev