Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 239 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 239 Week
» 34814 Month
» 104293 Year
» 1325858 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7766 m/e 02/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 02/1931
Withdrawal Wed 09/11/1960
Scrapping During 03/1961 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 29 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Radyr 4w/e 01/11/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 27/12/1958
   Withdrawn 09/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 88C Barry m/e 31/01/1959
WDN   09/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 7766
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 7766    
03/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev