Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1033 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8493 Week
» 6006 Month
» 233890 Year
» 1455455 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7775 m/e 11/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1131
To Service During 11/1930
Withdrawal Wed 09/11/1960
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 30 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1930
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/11/1955
   Withdrawn 09/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 30/11/1955
WDN   09/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 7775
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1131
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
09/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 7775    

prev prev