Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 451 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1836 Week
» 8641 Month
» 115587 Year
» 1337152 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7779 m/e 11/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During 11/1930
Withdrawal During 10/1958
Scrapping During 09/1968
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 04/10/1952
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/11/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 28/11/1953
OFFSTOCK UNK   m/e 31/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 7779
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 7779    
31/10/1958 Sightings Sold to London Transport for further use    

prev prev