|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed 2MT 78010 an 78011 is ready for trials. Diesel shunters are out up to 13074, with the next four nearly completed. J2 65023 (fully lined out) and J5 65488, both from 38A, arrived here on 3rd December for cutting up. J77 68281 has also been cut up. | SLS/195402 |
20/01/1954 | Darlington MPD | 78010/1 are working from West Auckland on Tebay mineral traffic and 65092 has gone to Kirkby Stephen for their Darlington passenger job. No. 45719 Glorious worked a down passenger through here on 9th January, and 64348 two trips York-Darlington the same week-end. | SLS/195402 |
12/08/1964 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) | Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. | SLS/196409 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 78010 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to West Auckland (51F) |
||
19/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
16/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
08/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
13/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
09/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) | ||
25/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
10/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 78010 | ||
12/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |